MI HB5327 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Weapons; licensing; firearms records; exempt from freedom of information act and provide for disclosure only under certain circumstances. Amends 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.421 - 28.435) by adding sec. 1b. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4155'13, HB 5324'14, HB 5325'14, HB 5326'14, HB 5328'14, HB 5329'14, SB 0049'13
Title
Weapons; licensing; firearms records; exempt from freedom of information act and provide for disclosure only under certain circumstances. Amends 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.421 - 28.435) by adding sec. 1b. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4155'13, HB 5324'14, HB 5325'14, HB 5326'14, HB 5328'14, HB 5329'14, SB 0049'13
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 109 (Y: 82 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 109 (Y: 82 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-03-13 | House | Transmitted |
2014-03-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 109 Yeas 82 Nays 27 |
2014-03-13 | House | Amended |
2014-03-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2014-03-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-02-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-02-18 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/14/2014 |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-02-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-02-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Bruce Rendon |