MI HB5231 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-15 - Printed Bill Filed 12/15/2011
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-15 - Printed Bill Filed 12/15/2011
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Animals; dogs; puppy protection act; create. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5230'11
Title
Animals; dogs; puppy protection act; create. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5230'11
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-15 | House | Printed Bill Filed 12/15/2011 |
2011-12-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2011-12-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-12-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Wayne Schmidt |
Same As/Similar To
SB0891 (Same As) 2012-01-11 - Referred To Committee On Agriculture
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2011-HB-5231 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/House/htm/2011-HIB-5231.htm |