MI HB5181 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Recommendation Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Recommendation Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement; public school employees; retirant employed in a critical shortage discipline area or to provide substitute teaching services without forfeiting retirement allowance; extend sunset. Amends sec. 61 of 1980 PA 300 (MCL 38.1361).
Title
Retirement; public school employees; retirant employed in a critical shortage discipline area or to provide substitute teaching services without forfeiting retirement allowance; extend sunset. Amends sec. 61 of 1980 PA 300 (MCL 38.1361).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Education (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2014-03-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Education |
2013-12-10 | House | Printed Bill Filed 12/06/2013 |
2013-12-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2013-12-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-12-05 | House | Introduced By Representative Pat Somerville |