MI HB5121 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Assigned Pa 56'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Assigned Pa 56'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Courts; judges; number of judgeships in the sixteenth circuit court; increase. Amends sec. 517 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.517). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5122'13, HB 5123'13, HB 5124'13, HB 5125'13
Title
Courts; judges; number of judgeships in the sixteenth circuit court; increase. Amends sec. 517 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.517). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5122'13, HB 5123'13, HB 5124'13, HB 5125'13
Sponsors
Rep. John Walsh [R] | Rep. Kevin Cotter [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 126 (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 126 (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 115 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 455 (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-05 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 455 (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 126 (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 115 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 455 (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-05 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 455 (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Assigned Pa 56'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-03-27 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/27/2014 @ 11:46 Am |
2014-03-27 | House | Approved By The Governor 3/26/2014 @ 9:00 Pm |
2014-03-25 | House | Presented To The Governor 3/25/2014 @ 2:02 Pm |
2014-03-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-03-20 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-03-20 | House | Roll Call # 126 Yeas 104 Nays 6 |
2014-03-20 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2014-03-19 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-03-19 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 115 Yeas 28 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2013-12-05 | House | Transmitted |
2013-12-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 455 Yeas 104 Nays 6 |
2013-12-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-12-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-12-04 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2013-12-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-11-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-11-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2013-11-05 | House | Printed Bill Filed 11/01/2013 |
2013-10-31 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2013-10-31 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-10-31 | House | Introduced By Representative John Walsh |