MI HB5119 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Assigned Pa 105'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Assigned Pa 105'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commercial code; bank deposits and collections; application of article 4a to certain fund transfers; revise. Amends sec. 4A108 of 1962 PA 174 (MCL 440.4608).
Title
Commercial code; bank deposits and collections; application of article 4a to certain fund transfers; revise. Amends sec. 4A108 of 1962 PA 174 (MCL 440.4608).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 164 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 163 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 138 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 163 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 138 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | House | Assigned Pa 105'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-04-17 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/10/2014 @ 4:02 Pm |
2014-04-17 | House | Approved By The Governor 4/7/2014 @ 9:52 Am |
2014-04-17 | House | Presented To The Governor 4/1/2014 @ 1:48 Pm |
2014-03-27 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-03-27 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-03-27 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 164 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 163 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 1 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-03-20 | House | Transmitted |
2014-03-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 138 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2014-03-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-03-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-11-05 | House | Printed Bill Filed 11/01/2013 |
2013-10-31 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Services |
2013-10-31 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-10-31 | House | Introduced By Representative Rob Verheulen |
Same As/Similar To
SB0550 (Same As) 2013-10-29 - Referred To Committee On Financial Services