MI HB5085 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Assigned Pa 201'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Assigned Pa 201'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Weapons; safety and training; requirement for physical presence of parent or guardian during use of a pistol by a minor; provide exception. Amends sec. 2 of 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.422).
Title
Weapons; safety and training; requirement for physical presence of parent or guardian during use of a pistol by a minor; provide exception. Amends sec. 2 of 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.422).
Sponsors
Rep. Philip Potvin [R] | Sen. Jon Bumstead [R] | Rep. Bruce Rendon [R] | Sen. Wayne Schmidt [R] |
Rep. Joseph Graves [R] | Rep. Matthew Lori [R] | Rep. Ben Glardon [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-11 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 391 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 391 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 409 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 114 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 391 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 409 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 114 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | House | Assigned Pa 201'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-07-16 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/24/2014 @ 4:58 Pm |
2014-07-16 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/21/2014 @ 5:20 Pm |
2014-07-16 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/17/2014 @ 9:54 Am |
2014-06-11 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-06-11 | House | Roll Call # 391 Yeas 109 Nays 1 |
2014-06-11 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-06-11 | House | Rule Suspended |
2014-06-11 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-06-11 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 409 Yeas 33 Nays 4 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-03-13 | House | Transmitted |
2014-03-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 114 Yeas 107 Nays 2 |
2014-03-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Amended |
2014-03-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-12-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-12-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-10-22 | House | Printed Bill Filed 10/18/2013 |
2013-10-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2013-10-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-10-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Phil Potvin |