MI HB5069 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Assigned Pa 223'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Assigned Pa 223'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property; other; prohibition on forcible entry by owner; provide exception if occupant is squatting. Amends secs. 2918, 5711 & 5714 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2918 et seq.).
Title
Property; other; prohibition on forcible entry by owner; provide exception if occupant is squatting. Amends secs. 2918, 5711 & 5714 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2918 et seq.).
Sponsors
Rep. Kurt Heise [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 437 (Y: 98 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 437 (Y: 98 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 429 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 422 (Y: 89 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 437 (Y: 98 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 429 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 422 (Y: 89 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | House | Assigned Pa 223'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-07-16 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/26/2014 @ 1:50 Pm |
2014-07-16 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/21/2014 @ 5:36 Pm |
2014-07-16 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/17/2014 @ 9:50 Am |
2014-06-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-06-12 | House | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-06-12 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-06-12 | House | Roll Call # 437 Yeas 98 Nays 12 |
2014-06-12 | House | Senate Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2014-06-12 | House | Rule Suspended |
2014-06-12 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-06-12 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-3 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 429 Yeas 32 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2013-11-14 | House | Transmitted |
2013-11-14 | House | Title Amended |
2013-11-14 | House | Passed Roll Call # 422 Yeas 89 Nays 21 |
2013-11-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-11-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-11-13 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2013-11-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-10-30 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-10-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2013-10-10 | House | Printed Bill Filed 10/10/2013 |
2013-10-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2013-10-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-10-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Kurt Heise |
Subjects
Crimes, trespassing
Housing, landlord and tenants
Property, abandoned
Property, other
Property, trespass
Housing, landlord and tenants
Property, abandoned
Property, other
Property, trespass