MI HB5058 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles: fund-raising registration plates; fund-raising registration plate for the Michigan 4-H; create. Amends 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.1 - 257.923) by adding sec. 811gg. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5056'23
Title
Vehicles: fund-raising registration plates; fund-raising registration plate for the Michigan 4-H; create. Amends 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.1 - 257.923) by adding sec. 811gg. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5056'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 508 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 508 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-11-08 | House | Transmitted |
2023-11-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 508 Yeas 105 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2023-11-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-11-08 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-11-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-11-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-10-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-10-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-09-28 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/27/2023 |
2023-09-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure |
2023-09-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-09-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Matt Bierlein |
Same As/Similar To
HB5056 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)