MI HB4898 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 28-2)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Placed On Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Placed On Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; other; NREPA programs; require peer review or benchmark analysis. Amends 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.101 - 324.90106) by adding pt. 27.
Title
Environmental protection; other; NREPA programs; require peer review or benchmark analysis. Amends 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.101 - 324.90106) by adding pt. 27.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Caul [R] | Rep. Hugh Crawford [R] | Sen. Kevin Daley [R] | Rep. Cindy Denby [R] |
Rep. Larry DeShazor [R] | Rep. Kevin Elsenheimer [R] | Rep. Robert Genetski [R] | Rep. Kevin Green [R] |
Rep. Gail Haines [R] | Sen. Goeff Hansen [R] | Rep. Joe Haveman [R] | Sen. Dave Hildenbrand [R] |
Sen. Kenneth Horn [R] | Sen. Rick Jones [R] | Rep. Eileen Kowall [R] | Rep. Pete Lund [R] |
Rep. Jeff Mayes [D] | Sen. Arlan Meekhof [R] | Rep. Kim Meltzer [R] | Rep. Tim Moore [R] |
Rep. Charles Moss [R] | Rep. Paul Opsommer [R] | Sen. Phillip Pavlov [R] | Rep. Tom Pearce [R] |
Sen. John Proos [R] | Rep. Bill Rogers [R] | Rep. Joel Sheltrown [D] | Sen. Jim Stamas [R] |
Rep. Sharon Tyler [R] | Rep. John Walsh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Placed On Second Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved | |
2010-03-10 | Notice Given To Discharge Committee | |
2010-03-10 | Motion To Discharge Committee Withdrawn | |
2010-03-09 | Notice Given To Discharge Committee | |
2009-05-07 | Printed Bill Filed 05/07/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Referred To Committee On Great Lakes And Environment | |
2009-05-06 | Read A First Time | |
2009-05-06 | Introduced By Representative Jim Stamas |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2009-HB-4898 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2009-2010/billintroduced/House/htm/2009-HIB-4898.htm |