MI HB4718 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure: defenses; sexual orientation or gender identity of a victim as a defense to a crime; prohibit. Amends 1927 PA 175 (MCL 760.1 - 777.69) by adding sec. 21d to ch. VIII.
Title
Civil procedure: defenses; sexual orientation or gender identity of a victim as a defense to a crime; prohibit. Amends 1927 PA 175 (MCL 760.1 - 777.69) by adding sec. 21d to ch. VIII.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 391 (Y: 56 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 391 (Y: 56 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety |
2023-10-19 | House | Transmitted |
2023-10-19 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 391 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2023-10-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-10-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-10-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-10-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-10-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-06-13 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/08/2023 |
2023-06-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2023-06-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-06-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Laurie Pohutsky |