MI HB4630 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 470'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 470'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; registration; registration fees; modify. Amends secs. 801, 801e, 803, 803a, 803b, 803p & 809 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.801 et seq.).
Title
Vehicles; registration; registration fees; modify. Amends secs. 801, 801e, 803, 803a, 803b, 803p & 809 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.801 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Senate Adopted Conference Report Roll Call # 936 (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-19 - House - House Third Reading: Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 782 (Y: 67 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 668 (Y: 1 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 425 (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Defeated Roll Call # 423 (Y: 18 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 215 (Y: 90 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-6 (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-19 - House - House Third Reading: Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 782 (Y: 67 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 668 (Y: 1 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 425 (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Defeated Roll Call # 423 (Y: 18 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 215 (Y: 90 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-6 (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 470'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/12/2015 @ 3:36 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/10/2015 @ 12:32 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/7/2015 @ 11:46 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Senate Adopted Conference Report Roll Call # 936 Yeas 23 Nays 15 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Conference Report Received In Senate |
2014-12-19 | House | Conference Report Adopted By Senate |
2014-12-19 | House | Retransmitted |
2014-12-19 | House | Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 782 Yeas 67 Nays 43 |
2014-12-19 | House | Rule Suspended |
2014-12-19 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-12-19 | House | Conference Report Received |
2014-12-16 | House | Referred To Conference Committee 12/12/2014 |
2014-12-16 | House | Senate Conferees Named 12/12/2014: Sens. Arlan Meekhof Michael Kowall Jim Ananich |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Senate Named Conferees 12/12/2014: Sens. Arlan Meekhof, Michael Kowall, Jim Ananich |
2014-12-11 | House | House Conferees Named 12/11/2014: Reps. Jim Stamas Rob Verheulen Marilyn Lane |
2014-12-11 | House | Roll Call # 668 Yeas 1 Nays 106 |
2014-12-11 | House | Senate Substitute S-3 Nonconcurred In |
2014-06-12 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-06-12 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-3 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Title Amended |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 425 Yeas 21 Nays 15 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Substitute S-3 As Amended Adopted |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reconsider Vote Postponed |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Defeated Roll Call # 423 Yeas 18 Nays 20 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Substitute S-3 As Amended Adopted |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Offered |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Infrastructure Modernization |
2014-05-08 | House | Transmitted |
2014-05-08 | House | Title Amended |
2014-05-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 215 Yeas 90 Nays 19 |
2014-05-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-05-08 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-05-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-05-08 | House | Substitute H-6 Adopted |
2014-05-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-05-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-05-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-6 |
2013-04-30 | House | Printed Bill Filed 04/26/2013 |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2013-04-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-04-25 | House | Introduced By Representative Michael Mccready |
Same As/Similar To
SB0088 (Same As) 2014-05-20 - Referred To Committee On Infrastructure Modernization