MI HB4614 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Referred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services
Pending: Senate Veterans And Emergency Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Referred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services
Pending: Senate Veterans And Emergency Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations: emergency medical services personnel; certain temporary licenses; make technical changes. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 20952a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4613'23
Title
Health occupations: emergency medical services personnel; certain temporary licenses; make technical changes. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 20952a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4613'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 5 (Y: 100 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services |
2024-02-07 | House | Transmitted |
2024-02-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 5 Yeas 100 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2024-02-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-02-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-02-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-10-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-10-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-05-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/23/2023 |
2023-05-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2023-05-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-05-23 | House | Introduced By Representative John Fitzgerald |
Same As/Similar To
HB4613 (Same As) 2024-02-13 - Referred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services
Subjects
Health occupations: emergency medical services personnel
State agencies (existing): health and human services
State agencies (existing): health and human services