MI HB4544 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-11)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 523'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-11)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 523'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax; home heating credit; amount of funding for weatherization; modify. Amends sec. 527a of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.527a).
Title
Individual income tax; home heating credit; amount of funding for weatherization; modify. Amends sec. 527a of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.527a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 760 (Y: 93 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 849 (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 657 (Y: 92 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 849 (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 657 (Y: 92 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 523'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/14/2015 @ 3:39 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/10/2015 @ 4:02 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/2/2015 @ 11:46 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-18 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-18 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-18 | House | Roll Call # 760 Yeas 93 Nays 17 |
2014-12-18 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-12-17 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-12-17 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 849 Yeas 31 Nays 6 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-12-10 | House | Transmitted |
2014-12-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 657 Yeas 92 Nays 17 |
2014-12-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-09 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2014-12-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2013-04-16 | House | Printed Bill Filed 04/12/2013 |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2013-04-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-04-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Dale Zorn |