MI HB4360 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Local government: authorities; emergency services authorities; allow to serve partial municipalities. Amends sec. 2 of 1988 PA 57 (MCL 124.602).
Title
Local government: authorities; emergency services authorities; allow to serve partial municipalities. Amends sec. 2 of 1988 PA 57 (MCL 124.602).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 558 (Y: 76 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 558 (Y: 76 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2023-11-09 | House | Transmitted |
2023-11-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 558 Yeas 76 Nays 30 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2023-11-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-11-09 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-11-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-11-09 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2023-11-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-06-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-06-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2023-04-12 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/11/2023 |
2023-04-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance |
2023-04-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-04-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Felicia Brabec |
Subjects
Local government: authorities
Local government: intergovernmental affairs
Local government: public services
Local government: intergovernmental affairs
Local government: public services