MI HB4156 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-8)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-19 - Referred To Committee On Reforms, Restructuring And Reinventing
Pending: Senate Reforms, Restructuring And Reinventing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-19 - Referred To Committee On Reforms, Restructuring And Reinventing
Pending: Senate Reforms, Restructuring And Reinventing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement; investments; posting of certain pension board expenditures; require. Amends sec. 13 of 1965 PA 314 (MCL 38.1133).
Title
Retirement; investments; posting of certain pension board expenditures; require. Amends sec. 13 of 1965 PA 314 (MCL 38.1133).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 139 (Y: 97 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-7 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-7 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Reforms, Restructuring And Reinventing |
2011-05-18 | House | Transmitted |
2011-05-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 139 Yeas 97 Nays 9 |
2011-05-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-05-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-05-12 | House | Substitute H-7 Adopted |
2011-05-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-05-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-05-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-7 |
2011-03-09 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Oversight, Reform, And Ethics |
2011-02-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-02-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2011-01-27 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/27/2011 |
2011-01-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight, Reform, And Ethics |
2011-01-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-01-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Tom Mcmillin |
Subjects
Communications, internet
Public employees and officers, compensation and benefits
Retirement, investments
Public employees and officers, compensation and benefits
Retirement, investments