ME LD962 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 83-26-2-1)
Status: Failed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 83-26-2-1)
Status: Failed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase Access to Higher Education
Title
An Act To Increase Access to Higher Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | Senate | Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2013-05-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-05-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-08 | House | On motion of Representative MacDONALD of Boothbay, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-08 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS, in concurrence. |
2013-03-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-14 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-03-14 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-03-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-03-12 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-03-12 | House | On motion of Representative MacDONALD of Boothbay, TABLED pending REFERENCE. |
2013-03-12 | House | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=962&snum=126 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0676&item=1&snum=126 |