ME LD684 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Make Bylaws and Minutes of Board Meetings of Publicly Funded Hospitals Subject to the Freedom of Access Act
Title
An Act To Make Bylaws and Minutes of Board Meetings of Publicly Funded Hospitals Subject to the Freedom of Access Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Macdonald [D] | Rep. Joseph Brooks [D] | Rep. Richard Farnsworth [D] | Rep. Charles Priest [D] |
Rep. Diane Russell [D] | Sen. Linda Sanborn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2013-03-20 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-20 | House | Subsequently, The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2013-03-20 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-03-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-03-14 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-03-14 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator VALENTINO of York REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator VALENTINO of York TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE, in concurrence. |
2013-02-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-26 | House | On motion of Representative PRIEST of Brunswick, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2013-02-26 | House | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=684&snum=126 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0476&item=1&snum=126 |