ME LD64 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Place Land in Centerville in Trust for the Passamaquoddy Tribe
Title
An Act To Place Land in Centerville in Trust for the Passamaquoddy Tribe
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-02 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-04-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-24 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2013-04-24 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2013-04-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-01-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator Tuttle of York, REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY, in concurrence. |
2013-01-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-01-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2013-01-22 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |