ME LD23 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Remove from the Maine Medical Use of Marijuana Act the Requirement That a Patient's Medical Condition Be Debilitating
Title
An Act To Remove from the Maine Medical Use of Marijuana Act the Requirement That a Patient's Medical Condition Be Debilitating
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-22 - Senate - Recede RC #322 (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp Rpt RC #260 (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-28 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #109 (Y: 113 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp Rpt RC #260 (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-28 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #109 (Y: 113 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-22 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2015-06-22 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-22 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-484). |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Subsequently, The Senate ADHERED To its previous action whereby the Minority OUGHT NOT TO PASS Report was Accepted , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 322 17 Yeas - 17 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent |
2015-06-22 | Senate | motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin that the Senate Recede From ACCEPTANCE of the Minority OUGHT NOT TO PASS Report FAILED |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2015-06-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION |
2015-06-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-19 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2015-06-19 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-484). |
2015-06-19 | House | On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-484) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-06-19 | House | On motion of Representative RUSSELL of Portland, the House RECEDED. |
2015-06-19 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-06-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-18 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-06-18 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | RELEASED. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem Subsequently, motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin to accept The Majority Ought to Pass Report FAILED Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 260 16 Yeas - 19 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. HELD at the Request of Senator McCORMICK of Kennebec. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-29 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending His Motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass Report , in concurrence. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin moved to to ACCEPT Majority OUGHT TO PASS Report |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Reports READ |
2015-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2015-05-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2015-05-28 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2015-05-28 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 109 (Yeas 113 - Nays 32 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2015-05-28 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-05-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-01-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on Health and Human Services, in concurrence. |
2015-01-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-01-13 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2015-01-13 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |