ME LD2276 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Increase Funding for the Snowmobile Trail Fund and the ATV Recreational Management Fund
Title
An Act to Increase Funding for the Snowmobile Trail Fund and the ATV Recreational Management Fund
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2024-04-17 | Senate | TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE |
2024-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence |
2024-03-26 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2024-03-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED |
2024-03-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2024-03-25 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2024-03-25 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-25 | House | Reported by Representative LANDRY for the Joint Standing Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife pursuant to Joint Order 2023, H.P. 1438. |