ME LD2257 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Allow School Administrative District No. 52 to Issue Temporary Notes for a Wastewater Treatment Project
Title
An Act to Allow School Administrative District No. 52 to Issue Temporary Notes for a Wastewater Treatment Project
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2024-03-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-03-27 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2024-03-25 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2024-03-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2024-03-25 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-20 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2024-03-13 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2024-03-13 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-03-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |