ME LD2256 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Provide Emergency One-time Relief from the Wild Blueberry Tax for Growers
Title
An Act to Provide Emergency One-time Relief from the Wild Blueberry Tax for Growers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2024-03-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-03-27 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-845), in concurrence. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-845) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-845). |
2024-03-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2024-03-25 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2024-03-20 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2024-03-13 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2024-03-13 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-03-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator Ingwersen of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry, in concurrence. |
2024-03-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-06 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2024-03-06 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |