ME LD2201 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Placement of Portable Toilets
Title
An Act Regarding the Placement of Portable Toilets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-03-25 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-586). |
2024-03-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2024-03-25 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-586). |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-586) READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-19 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2024-03-05 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2024-03-05 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-02-27 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2024-02-01 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-02-01 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot REFERENCE to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed |