ME LD2195 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Protect Businesses from Fraudulent or Predatory Financial Settlements by Allowing Those Businesses Opportunities to Remove Architectural Barriers in Noncompliance with the Maine Human Rights Act
Title
An Act to Protect Businesses from Fraudulent or Predatory Financial Settlements by Allowing Those Businesses Opportunities to Remove Architectural Barriers in Noncompliance with the Maine Human Rights Act
Sponsors
Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] | Sen. Craig Hickman [D] | Sen. Lisa Keim [R] | Sen. Teresa Pierce [D] |
Sen. Matthew Pouliot [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2024-02-29 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2024-02-13 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2024-02-13 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-02-07 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2024-01-30 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=2195&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0934&item=1&snum=131 |