ME LD2158 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, to Improve the Housing Voucher System and Reduce the Number of Voucher Expirations
Title
Resolve, to Improve the Housing Voucher System and Reduce the Number of Voucher Expirations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-27 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-850), in concurrence. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-850) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-850). |
2024-03-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2024-03-25 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2024-03-22 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2024-02-20 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2024-02-20 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-02-02 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2024-01-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator Pierce of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Joint Select Committee on Housing, in concurrence. |
2024-01-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Joint Select Committee on HOUSING. |
2024-01-09 | House | Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed. |