ME LD2147 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Change the Requirement for Edible Cannabis Products to Be Stamped or Embossed on Each Serving with a Universal Symbol
Title
An Act to Change the Requirement for Edible Cannabis Products to Be Stamped or Embossed on Each Serving with a Universal Symbol
Sponsors
Rep. David Boyer [R] | Rep. Sally Cluchey [D] | Sen. Craig Hickman [D] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] |
Rep. Nina Milliken [D] | Rep. Joshua Morris [R] | Rep. Laura Supica [D] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #444 (Y: 102 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2024-04-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-03 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-04-03 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-880) in concurrence |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-880) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-04-02 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-04-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-880) Report ACCEPTED |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-04-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-01 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-880). |
2024-04-01 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2024-04-01 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-880) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-04-01 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2024-04-01 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 444 (Yeas 102 - Nays 36 - Absent 13 - Excused 0) |
2024-04-01 | House | On motion of Representative SUPICA of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2024-04-01 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-03-28 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM |
2024-02-14 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-02-14 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-01-31 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2024-01-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2024-01-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2024-01-03 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |