ME LD2142 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Correct Outdated References in and Relating to the Maine Human Rights Act
Title
An Act to Correct Outdated References in and Relating to the Maine Human Rights Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-765), in concurrence. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-765) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-02-28 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-02-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-02-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-02-27 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-765). |
2024-02-27 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2024-02-27 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-765) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-02-27 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2024-02-27 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2024-02-27 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-02-22 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2024-02-06 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-02-06 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-01-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2024-01-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2024-01-03 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |