ME LD2135 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding the Operation and Future Capacity of State-owned Landfills
Title
Resolve, Regarding the Operation and Future Capacity of State-owned Landfills
Sponsors
Sen. James Dill [D] | Rep. William Bridgeo [D] | Rep. Richard Campbell [R] | Rep. Scott Cyrway [R] |
Rep. Nina Milliken [D] | Rep. Stephen Moriarty [D] | Rep. Laurie Osher [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - House - Adopt Hah-940 RC #474 (Y: 79 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - Recede And Concur RC #457 (Y: 76 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - Table Until Later RC #456 (Y: 66 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Adopt Sbs-639 RC #650 (Y: 16 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-04-03 - House - Recede And Concur RC #457 (Y: 76 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - Table Until Later RC #456 (Y: 66 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Adopt Sbs-639 RC #650 (Y: 16 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2024-04-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-10 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-828) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-940) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-612) thereto in concurrence |
2024-04-09 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-09 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2024-04-09 | House | Subsequently, the Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-828) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-940) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-612) thereto. |
2024-04-09 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-828) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-940) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-612) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2024-04-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 474 (Yeas 79 - Nays 65 - Absent 6 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2024-04-09 | House | On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-940) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-828) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-04-09 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-828). |
2024-04-09 | House | On motion of Representative GRAMLICH of Old Orchard Beach, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-828). |
2024-04-03 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-03 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 457 (Yeas 76 - Nays 68 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2024-04-03 | House | Subsequently, the House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-828) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-612) thereto. |
2024-04-03 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 456 (Yeas 66 - Nays 74 - Absent 11 - Excused 0) |
2024-04-03 | House | Motion of Representative FAULKINGHAM of Winter Harbor to TABLE the resolve until later in today's session FAILED. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-828) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-612) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-828) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-612) thereto ADOPTED |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 650 Yeas 16 - Nays 16 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 FAILED |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senator BENNETT of Oxford moved to Adopt Senate Amendment "B" (S-639) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-828) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRENNER of Cumberland Senate Amendment "A" (S-612) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-828) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-828) READ |
2024-04-02 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Subsequently Report Accepted |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRENNER of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the Report in concurrence |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Report READ |
2024-03-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-19 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-828). |
2024-03-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2024-03-19 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2024-03-15 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2024-02-08 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2024-02-08 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-01-31 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2024-01-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2024-01-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-03 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2024-01-03 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |