ME LD2110 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Amend the Laws Governing Licensing of Payroll Processors
Title
An Act to Amend the Laws Governing Licensing of Payroll Processors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #653 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2024-04-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-09 | House | On motion of Representative PERRY of Calais, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2024-04-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 653 Yeas 29 - Nays 1 - Excused 5 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2024-04-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator BAILEY of York The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-04-02 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2024-03-13 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-03-13 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-01-03 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |