ME LD1833 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - 21 Yeas - 14 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - 21 Yeas - 14 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Workers' Compensation Board To Further Study Improving Protections for Injured Workers Whose Employers Have Wrongfully Not Secured Workers' Compensation Insurance
Title
Resolve, Directing the Workers' Compensation Board To Further Study Improving Protections for Injured Workers Whose Employers Have Wrongfully Not Secured Workers' Compensation Insurance
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #626 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-17 - House - Passage To Be Engrossed RC #732 (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - Passage To Be Engrossed RC #732 (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Senate | 21 Yeas - 14 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Roll Call # 626 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | LD 1833 In Senate, May 1, 2014, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 21 In the Affirmative and 14 In the Nagative , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-848) thereto , in concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-491) |
2014-04-17 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 732 (Yeas 139 - Nays 3 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2014-04-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-491) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-848) thereto. |
2014-04-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-491) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-848) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2014-04-17 | House | On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-848) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-491) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-04-17 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the House RECEDED. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | FAILED FINAL PASSAGE , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | TAKEN from the Special Study Table by Senator ALFOND of Cumberland. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator HASKELL of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required , in concurrence. |
2014-04-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-08 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2014-04-04 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-04 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-491). |
2014-04-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2014-04-04 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2014-04-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-491). |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-491) READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-19 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-19 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
2014-03-19 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator Patrick of Oxford REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reported by Senator PATRICK for the Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development pursuant to Resolve 2013, chapter 40, section 2. |