ME LD1702 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, to Establish the Commission to Improve the Educational Experience of People Who Are Resettling in Maine
Title
Resolve, to Establish the Commission to Improve the Educational Experience of People Who Are Resettling in Maine
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-26 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2023-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2023-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-12 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-352) in concurrence |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-352) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-07 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-352). |
2023-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2023-06-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-352) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-06-07 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2023-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-20 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2023-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-18 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-04-18 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |