ME LD1672 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require That Private Schools That Enroll 60 Percent or More Publicly Funded Students Meet Certain Requirements
Title
An Act To Require That Private Schools That Enroll 60 Percent or More Publicly Funded Students Meet Certain Requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] | Sen. Anne Carney [D] | Sen. Craig Hickman [D] | Sen. Marianne Moore [R] |
Rep. Anne Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - Senate - Enactment RC #405 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Indefinitely Postpone RC #404 (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Enactment RC #368 (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Indefinitely Postpone RC #367 (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #334 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #204 (Y: 80 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Indefinitely Postpone RC #404 (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Enactment RC #368 (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Indefinitely Postpone RC #367 (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #334 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #204 (Y: 80 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 404 Yeas 16 - Nays 18 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Senator BENNETT of Oxford moved to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE Bill and accompanying papers FAILED |
2021-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill FAILED ENACTMENT |
2021-06-15 | Senate | HELD at the Request of Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | President Jackson ruled the Table Motion was Out of Order |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Senator BENNETT of Oxford asked for Point of Order |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin moved to Table |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 368 Yeas 17 - Nays 17 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-15 | Senate | FAILED ENACTMENT |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 367 Yeas 16 - Nays 18 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator BENNETT of Oxford Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED FAILED |
2021-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-463) in concurrence |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-463) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 334 Yeas 18 - Nays 16 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York The Report A Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF ANY REPORT |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-463). |
2021-06-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-09 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-463) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 204 (Yeas 80 - Nays 62 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-09 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-05-03 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on May 3, 2021. |