ME LD1626 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on March 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 418 24 Yeas - 10 Nays- 0 Excused - 1 Absent
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on March 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 418 24 Yeas - 10 Nays- 0 Excused - 1 Absent
Summary
An Act To Amend the Unemployment Compensation Laws Regarding Vacation Pay
Title
An Act To Amend the Unemployment Compensation Laws Regarding Vacation Pay
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 418 24 Yeas - 10 Nays- 0 Excused - 1 Absent | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-648) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-540) thereto | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2010-04-07 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-648) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-540) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-648) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-540) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-04-07 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-540) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-648) READ and ADOPTED | |
2010-04-07 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-648) in concurrence | |
2010-04-07 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-648) in concurrence | |
2010-04-07 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE | |
2010-03-17 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence | |
2010-03-16 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-16 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-03-11 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-648) in concurrence | |
2010-03-11 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2010-03-09 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2010-03-09 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-648) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-09 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-03-09 | (S) On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-648) Report ACCEPTED in concurrence (Remarks Made) Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 302 22 Yeas - 12 Nays- 0 Excused - 1 Absent | |
2010-03-09 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2010-03-04 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-04 | (S) On motion by Senator RAYE of Washington Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook to ACCEPT Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-648) Report in concurrence | |
2010-03-04 | (S) Senator JACKSON of Aroostook moved to Accept Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-648) Report in concurrence | |
2010-03-04 | (S) Reports READ | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-02 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-648) | |
2010-03-02 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2010-02-25 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2010-02-25 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-648) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2010-02-25 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2010-02-25 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 268 (Yeas 81 - Nays 53 - Absent 17 - Excused 0) | |
2010-02-25 | (H) On motion of Representative TUTTLE of Sanford, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2010-02-25 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2009-12-23 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. | |
2009-12-23 | (H) Received by the Clerk of the House on December 21, 2009. |