ME LD1549 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Unfinished Business
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Unfinished Business
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Direct the Public Utilities Commission to Seek Informational Bids Regarding Small Modular Nuclear Reactors in the State
Title
An Act to Direct the Public Utilities Commission to Seek Informational Bids Regarding Small Modular Nuclear Reactors in the State
Sponsors
Rep. Reagan Paul [R] | Rep. Mark Babin [R] | Rep. Richard Campbell [R] | Rep. Larry Dunphy [R] |
Rep. Steven Foster [R] | Sen. Matthew Harrington [R] | Rep. Mark Walker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-27 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-02-29 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-02-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-02-27 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-02-22 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-02-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-02-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-02-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-02-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-02-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-02-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-02-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-01-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-01-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-01-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-01-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-01-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-01-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-01-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-01-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-07-26 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-07-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-27 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-26 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-22 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-08 | House | Later today assigned. |
2023-06-08 | House | On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2023-06-08 | House | Representative ZEIGLER of Montville moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2023-06-08 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2023-05-31 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-31 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2023-05-10 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-10 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-06 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence |
2023-04-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-06 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2023-04-06 | House | Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed. |