ME LD1223 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - 26 Yeas - 6 Nays- 0 Excused - 3 Absent PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - 26 Yeas - 6 Nays- 0 Excused - 3 Absent PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Authorize a General Fund Bond Issue To Support Human Health Research in Maine
Title
An Act To Authorize a General Fund Bond Issue To Support Human Health Research in Maine
Sponsors
Sen. Emily Cain [D] | Sen. James Dill [D] | Sen. Seth Goodall [D] | Sen. Roger Katz [R] |
Rep. Brian Hubbell [D] | Rep. Dennis Keschl [R] | Rep. Mary Nelson [D] | Rep. Ryan Tipping-Spitz [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - House - Enactment - Bond Issue RC #738 (Y: 113 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - Senate - Enact-bond Issue 2/3 Vote RC #607 (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - Senate - Enact-bond Issue 2/3 Vote RC #607 (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | 26 Yeas - 6 Nays- 0 Excused - 3 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 607 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Present Required, in concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 738 (Yeas 113 - Nays 32 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2014-04-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-04-17 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-557). |
2014-04-17 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2014-04-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2014-04-17 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-557) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-557) READ and ADOPTED |
2014-04-17 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2013-07-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-07-09 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-03-26 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-26 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator Hill of York REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed |