ME LD1175 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Review the Laws Governing Retirement Benefits for Certain State Employees
Title
An Act To Review the Laws Governing Retirement Benefits for Certain State Employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - House - Enactment RC #725 (Y: 105 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - House - Enactment RC #553 (Y: 99 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - House - Enactment RC #553 (Y: 99 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 725 (Yeas 105 - Nays 38 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2014-04-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-04-17 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-413) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-544) thereto |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-413) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-544) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-413) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-544) thereto ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-544) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-413) READ and ADOPTED, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator The Senate Under suspension of the Rules, RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-413). |
2014-04-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York, the Senate, Under suspension of the rules, RECONSIDERED whereby Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-413), in concurrence. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator Hill of York. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator CAIN of Penobscot PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT , in concurrence. |
2014-03-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-21 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 553 (Yeas 99 - Nays 40 - Absent 12 - Excused 0) |
2014-03-21 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-03-19 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-413). |
2014-03-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2014-03-19 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-413) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-03-19 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2014-03-19 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-19 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2014-03-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-12 | House | Later today assigned. |
2014-03-12 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2014-03-12 | House | Reports READ. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-413). |
2014-03-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-413) READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-07-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-07-09 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-03-26 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-26 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator Hill of York REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed |