MD SB909 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the designation of the "Developmental Disabilities Waiting List Equity Fund Contribution" checkoff on the individual income tax return form to the "Developmental Disabilities Services and Support Fund Contribution".
Title
Income Tax Checkoff - Developmental Disabilities Services and Support Fund - Designation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2014-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {849830/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |