MD SB876 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 568
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 568
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Summer Career Academy Pilot Program and identifying the purpose of the Program; requiring the State Department of Education to develop criteria for the selection of eligible school systems and eligible students for participation in the Program; authorizing the State Superintendent of Schools to select up to four school systems to participate in the Program; requiring a student selected to participate in the Program to be assigned a summer career counselor and to receive a stipend of up to $4,500; etc.
Title
Education - Summer Career Academy Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 568 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) |
2014-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {225367/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {254234/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Economic and Community Development
Education
Education, State Department of
Grants
Job Training
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Schools
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Education
Education, State Department of
Grants
Job Training
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Schools
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment