MD SB859 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Governor to include in the annual budget bill a certain appropriation to the Division of Rehabilitation Services in the State Department of Education to ensure the State match amount for the Division is met as required by certain federal acts.
Title
State Department of Education - Division of Rehabilitation Services - Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2024-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-29 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1163 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Developmentally Disabled Persons
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Governor
Intergovernmental Cooperation
Physically Disabled Persons
Revenue and Taxes
Vocational Rehabilitation
Budgets
Developmentally Disabled Persons
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Governor
Intergovernmental Cooperation
Physically Disabled Persons
Revenue and Taxes
Vocational Rehabilitation