MD SB736 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Harford County to issue a Class GSF (golf simulator facility) license to a golf simulator facility under certain circumstances; authorizing the license holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor for on-premises consumption under certain circumstances; requiring the license holder to submit an annual gross sales report to the Board before a license may be renewed; and establishing an annual license fee of $1,500.
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Golf Simulator Facility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2024-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB632 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-06 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Fees
Food
Harford County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Reports
Retail Sales
Sports and Recreation
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Fees
Food
Harford County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Reports
Retail Sales
Sports and Recreation
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 1003.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |