MD SB665 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the positions eligible for membership in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System to include security chief, facility administrator, assistant warden, and warden; authorizing specified individuals to cease membership in the Employees' Pension System and enroll in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System; authorizing specified individuals to transfer service credit from the Employees' Pension System to the Correctional Officers' Retirement System; etc.
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Sponsors
Sen. George Edwards [R] | Sen. Christopher Shank [R] | Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] | Sen. Richard Colburn [R] |
Sen. Verna Jones-Rodwell [D] | Sen. Nathaniel McFadden [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188 |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2014-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2014-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-26 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2014-03-25 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {939038/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 8:30 a.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Correctional Officers
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Sunset
Correctional Officers
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Sunset