MD SB646 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-12)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that, beginning December 31, 2014, the State health plan methodologies, standards, and criteria for licensed hospice certificate of need review shall use specified data from specified years to calculate a specified volume threshold; requiring the Commission, in collaboration with the Hospice and Palliative Care Network, to incorporate in a specified methodology recognition that hospice utilization may be influenced by a specified demographic makeup; etc.
Title
State Health Plan - Licensed Hospice Programs - Certificate of Need Review
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-05 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2014-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {997478/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Planning and Cost Review
Hospices
Licenses
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Planning and Cost Review
Hospices
Licenses