MD SB615 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing to four the number of gaming events that a specified organization in Frederick County may hold in a calendar year in which the major prize has a value of more than $5,000.
Title
Frederick County - Gaming Permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Churches
Education
Fire Protection
Frederick County
Gaming
Hospitals
Nonprofit Organizations
Raffles
Rescue Squads
Sports and Recreation
Veterans
Volunteers
Education
Fire Protection
Frederick County
Gaming
Hospitals
Nonprofit Organizations
Raffles
Rescue Squads
Sports and Recreation
Veterans
Volunteers