MD SB605 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 538
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 538
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Baltimore City, a county, or a municipal corporation to provide a property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on an existing commercial structure in which a specified investment is made to allow for the adaptive reuse of the structure; providing for the amount and duration of the tax credit; etc.
Title
Property Tax Credit - Commercial Structures - Rehabilitation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 538 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2014-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-19 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {969634/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Commercial Rehabilitation
Counties
Elevators
Fire Protection
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Commercial Rehabilitation
Counties
Elevators
Fire Protection
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local