MD SB558 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of a "local government" under the Local Government Tort Claims Act to include the nonprofit corporation serving as the Industrial Development Authority in Carroll County; providing that a specified notice requirement does not apply to specified actions against a specified nonprofit corporation in Carroll County or its employees; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Title
Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Industrial Development Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-2) (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-3) (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-3) (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-2) |
2014-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-3) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {998277/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Carroll County
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Corporations
Counties - Local Laws
Industry and Technology
Liability
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Sovereign Immunity
Torts
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Corporations
Counties - Local Laws
Industry and Technology
Liability
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Sovereign Immunity
Torts