MD SB477 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 402
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 402
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an annual appropriation of $3,000,000 to be used for branches of the Enoch Pratt Free Library that extend operating hours and services above those in effect as of January 1, 2016; declaring that it is the intent of the General Assembly to utilize increased operating hours and services to advance the library's commitment to equity, inclusion, and greater access to library resources, programs, and services; etc.
Title
Enoch Pratt Free Library - Operating Hours and Funding
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] | Sen. Charles Sydnor [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Sen. Antonio Hayes [D] |
Sen. Mary Washington [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 116 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 402 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (116-22) |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Reassigned to Budget and Taxation |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB436 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 401
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Counties - Local Laws
Education - Local Bills
Libraries
Reports
Time
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Counties - Local Laws
Education - Local Bills
Libraries
Reports
Time