MD SB477 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 479
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 479
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the name of the Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program at Institutions of Higher Education to be the Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program; authorizing food service facilities under the Program to store and make available for administration auto-injectable epinephrine for individuals who are experiencing or are believed to be experiencing anaphylaxis when a physician or emergency medical services are not immediately available; altering the purpose of the Program; etc.
Title
Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 479 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1462 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 478
Subjects
Certifications
Drugs
Emergencies
Equipment
Fees
Food
Health
Higher Education
Liability
Medical Treatments
Names
Public Health
Records
Reports
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Storage
Drugs
Emergencies
Equipment
Fees
Food
Health
Higher Education
Liability
Medical Treatments
Names
Public Health
Records
Reports
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Storage
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 13 | 7A-05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 7A-06 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13-7A | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13-7A | 07 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13-7A | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13-7A | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13-7A | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13-7A | 8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13-7A | 9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |