MD SB47 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting to property placed in service before January 1, 2014, the applicability of Maryland income tax modifications for specified deductions for the cost of business property that is treated as an expense for federal income tax purposes; limiting to property placed in service before January 1, 2014, the applicability of Maryland income tax modifications for a specified additional depreciation allowance under the federal income tax for specified business property; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Expensing of Business Property and Bonus Depreciation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-24 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-10-21 | Senate | Pre-filed |