MD SB460 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "person in a position of authority" for purposes of a specified prohibition against engaging in sexual contact, a sexual act, or vaginal intercourse with a specified minor; repealing a requirement that the "person in a position of authority" be a full-time permanent employee of a school; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Person in a Position of Authority - Sexual Offenses With a Minor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-04-07 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2014-04-05 | House | Delegates Dumais, Arora, and Hough |
2014-04-05 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2014-04-05 | House | House Refuses to Recede |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senators Zirkin, Brochin, and Shank |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) |
2014-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {482510/2 Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2014-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {968673/2 Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Contractors
Counselors
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Private Schools
Public Employees
Public Schools
Sexual Offenses
Sports and Recreation
Statutes of Limitation
Students
Teachers
Volunteers
Work, Labor and Employment
Counselors
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Private Schools
Public Employees
Public Schools
Sexual Offenses
Sports and Recreation
Statutes of Limitation
Students
Teachers
Volunteers
Work, Labor and Employment