MD SB432 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the manner in which a member of the Employees' Pension System or Teachers' Pension System may combine specified prior eligibility service with the member's current service; clarifying that specified prior service does not need to be subject to a different rate of member contributions; and making conforming changes.
Title
Employees' and Teachers' Pension Systems - Combination of Service - Clarification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2015-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-13 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {439939/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 8:30 a.m. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 8:30 a.m. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 8:30 a.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Interest
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment